Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 35 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5566 Week
» 7304 Month
» 134747 Year
» 1800123 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1208 m/e 08/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6208   07/03/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3555   12/12/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3757 on 07/02/1947
British Railways 63757 w/e 12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19864
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Fri 24/11/1961 off Mexborough (41F)
Service Life 49 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1912
GRI   Grimsby on 20/09/1912
MEX   Mexborough on 15/11/1919
DON   Doncaster on 18/08/1946
40E   Langwith Junction on 25/06/1950
40E   Langwith Junction m/e 30/06/1950
36B   Mexborough on 10/09/1950
     Withdrawn on 24/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 10/09/1950
WDN   on 24/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1474)
21/04/1917 Diagram 15Sat boiler fitted (number 1676)
05/11/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1948)
04/02/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 828)
25/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1013)
10/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1057)
15/01/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3312)
09/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3257)
15/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3232)
08/09/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3335)
12/06/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3430)
27/01/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22157)
13/07/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22246)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 30/12/1916 21/04/1917 113 days General Fitted with a saturated boiler
Boiler number 1676 (Diagram 15Sat)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1921 05/11/1921 36 days General Fitted with a superheated boiler again
Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1923 12/05/1923 57 days General    
Gorton Works 17/01/1925 07/03/1925 50 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6208
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1927 04/02/1928 43 days General Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1929 01/02/1930 36 days General    
Gorton Works 11/06/1932 25/06/1932 15 days General Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1935 10/08/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1057 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/12/1937 15/01/1938 22 days General Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1940 09/11/1940 8 days General Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1943 15/05/1943 8 days General Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1945 08/09/1945 15 days General Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1945 03/11/1945 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 15/05/1948 12/06/1948 29 days General Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63757
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1949 07/05/1949 8 days Light Casual After collision
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1951 27/01/1951 15 days General Boiler number 22157 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1953 19/09/1953 15 days General    
Gorton Works 22/06/1957 13/07/1957 22 days General Boiler number 22246 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/09/1959 10/10/1959 29 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 25/11/1961 25/11/1961 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1208
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19864
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Grimsby (GRI)    
30/12/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1916. Dep: 21/04/1917.
Work undertaken:
Fitted with a saturated boiler
Boiler number 1676 (Diagram 15Sat)
   
15/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
01/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921.
Work undertaken:
Fitted with a superheated boiler again
Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15)
   
17/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1923. Dep: 12/05/1923.    
17/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 07/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6208
   
24/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
   
28/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1929. Dep: 01/02/1930.    
11/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15)
   
27/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1057 (Diagram 15)
   
25/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1937. Dep: 15/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15)
   
02/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15)
   
08/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 15)
   
25/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945.    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3555    
07/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3757    
15/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63757
   
30/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/04/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
10/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
13/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1951. Dep: 27/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22157 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1953. Dep: 19/09/1953.    
22/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1957. Dep: 13/07/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22246 (Diagram 15)
   
12/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1959. Dep: 10/10/1959.    
24/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63757 from Mexborough (41F)    
25/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/11/1961. Dep: 25/11/1961.    

prev prev