|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/12/1916 | 21/04/1917 | 113 days | General | Fitted with a saturated boiler Boiler number 1676 (Diagram 15Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1921 | 05/11/1921 | 36 days | General | Fitted with a superheated boiler again Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1923 | 12/05/1923 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1925 | 07/03/1925 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6208 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1927 | 04/02/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1929 | 01/02/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1932 | 25/06/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1935 | 10/08/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1057 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/12/1937 | 15/01/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1940 | 09/11/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 15/05/1948 | 12/06/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63757 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1949 | 07/05/1949 | 8 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1951 | 27/01/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22157 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1953 | 19/09/1953 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1957 | 13/07/1957 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22246 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1959 | 10/10/1959 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1961 | 25/11/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1208 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19864 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
20/09/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grimsby (GRI) | ||
30/12/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1916. Dep: 21/04/1917. Work undertaken: Fitted with a saturated boiler Boiler number 1676 (Diagram 15Sat) |
||
15/11/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
01/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921. Work undertaken: Fitted with a superheated boiler again Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1923. Dep: 12/05/1923. | ||
17/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 07/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6208 |
||
24/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1929. Dep: 01/02/1930. | ||
11/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1057 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1937. Dep: 15/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3555 | ||
07/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3757 | ||
15/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63757 |
||
30/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/04/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
10/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
13/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1951. Dep: 27/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22157 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1953. Dep: 19/09/1953. | ||
22/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1957. Dep: 13/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22246 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1959. Dep: 10/10/1959. | ||
24/11/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63757 from Mexborough (41F) | ||
25/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/11/1961. Dep: 25/11/1961. |