Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 51 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1888 Week
» 13033 Month
» 112818 Year
» 1778194 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1210 m/e 08/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6210   15/08/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3557   05/01/1947
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3762   02/03/1947
British Railways 63762 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19866
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Fri 16/03/1962 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Service Life 49 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 17/3/62

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1912
MEX   Mexborough on 17/10/1919
CLK   Colwick on 28/01/1945
ANN   Annesley on 30/03/1947
CLK   Colwick on 28/03/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 03/04/1948
ANN   Annesley on 19/09/1948
ANN   Annesley w/e 25/09/1948
CLK   Colwick on 10/07/1949
CLK   Colwick w/e 16/07/1949
38D   Staveley (G.C.) on 21/10/1951
38D   Staveley (G.C.) w/e 27/10/1951
     Withdrawn on 16/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 05/04/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 03/04/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 25/09/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) w/e 27/10/1951
WDN   on 16/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1476)
24/03/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1680)
08/10/1921 Ross Pop
08/10/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1938)
21/07/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1323)
01/11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1198)
02/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1179)
11/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 929)
11/07/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
08/04/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3271)
25/04/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3264)
01/07/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3428)
29/06/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3352)
04/09/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3208)
23/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22105)
07/03/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22102)
26/03/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22148)
02/08/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22289)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 09/12/1916 24/03/1917 106 days General Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1921 08/10/1921 57 days General Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1923 04/08/1923 78 days General    
Gorton Works 30/05/1925 15/08/1925 78 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6210
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1928 21/07/1928 29 days General Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1930 01/11/1930 22 days General Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1933 02/09/1933 15 days General Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1933 23/12/1933 36 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 27/06/1936 11/07/1936 15 days General Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1939 08/04/1939 15 days General Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1942 25/04/1942 12 days General Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1944 01/07/1944 8 days General Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1946 29/06/1946 22 days General Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1948 04/09/1948 22 days General Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63762
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1950 23/09/1950 22 days General Boiler number 22105 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1951 26/01/1952 29 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 21/02/1953 07/03/1953 15 days General Boiler number 22102 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1955 26/03/1955 22 days General Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1958 02/08/1958 50 days General Boiler number 22289 (Diagram 15)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/03/1962 Gorton Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1210
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19866
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/12/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1916. Dep: 24/03/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
   
17/10/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
13/08/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1921. Dep: 08/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop
   
19/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1923. Dep: 04/08/1923.    
30/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6210
   
23/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 21/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
   
11/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15)
   
19/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15)
   
18/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933.    
27/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
25/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 08/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15)
   
14/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
   
24/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15)
   
28/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15)
   
05/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3557    
02/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3762    
30/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
28/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
03/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
14/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63762
   
19/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
25/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
10/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
02/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1950. Dep: 23/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22105 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
27/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
29/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1951. Dep: 26/01/1952.    
21/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22102 (Diagram 15)
   
05/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15)
   
14/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1958. Dep: 02/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22289 (Diagram 15)
   
16/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63762 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev