|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/02/1917 | 26/05/1917 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 1444 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1922 | 25/11/1922 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/07/1924 | 01/11/1924 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6211 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1927 | 07/05/1927 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1929 | 19/10/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1932 | 17/09/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1935 | 09/03/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1937 | 12/06/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1939 | 02/12/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/03/1942 | 20/06/1942 | 83 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1943 | 27/10/1943 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1946 | 09/03/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1948 | 13/03/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3772 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1949 | 19/11/1949 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | Renumbered to BR 63772 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1950 | 21/10/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1952 | 25/10/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22321 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/12/1954 | 29/01/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1955 | 03/12/1955 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1955 | 12/12/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1957 | 06/04/1957 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1960 | 23/04/1960 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1211 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19867 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/10/1915 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
03/02/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1917. Dep: 26/05/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1444 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/09/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1922. Dep: 25/11/1922. | ||
26/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1924. Dep: 01/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6211 |
||
02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929. | ||
03/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 17/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D) |
||
03/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
27/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 27/10/1943. Dep: 27/10/1943. | ||
06/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D) |
||
06/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
23/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D) |
||
29/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
30/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3558 | ||
24/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3772 | ||
21/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3772 |
||
29/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/10/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63772 |
||
07/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1950. Dep: 21/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D) |
||
13/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (53E) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (53E) | ||
12/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Royston (20C) | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
27/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
11/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1952. Dep: 25/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22321 (Diagram 15D) |
||
25/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1954. Dep: 29/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D) |
||
17/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955. | ||
06/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1955. Dep: 12/12/1955. | ||
16/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D) |
||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
19/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/03/1960. Dep: 23/04/1960. | ||
09/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
13/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
03/03/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63772 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |