Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 60 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4532 Week
» 23433 Month
» 23433 Year
» 1688809 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1214 m/e 09/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6214   04/09/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3561   29/11/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3777 on 27/03/1947
British Railways 63777 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/109/1912
O1 (2-8-0)02/11/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19870
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/10/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 50 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1912
ANN Annesley on 23/09/1912
CLK Colwick on 13/10/1940
DON Doncaster on 23/01/1944
GOR Gorton on 25/06/1945
DON Doncaster on 09/09/1945
GOR Gorton on 03/11/1946
38B Annesley on 20/10/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 27/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 09/11/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 28/10/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 27/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1480)
15/12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1468)
03/11/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1144)
04/09/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1536)
22/11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1958)
01/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1097)
21/09/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3208)
14/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1870)
11/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1297)
10/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3284)
22/04/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1006)
02/11/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5086)
30/04/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5005)
11/08/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28813)
05/09/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28809)
20/08/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28132)
13/07/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28275)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 25/08/1917 15/12/1917 113 days General
Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1920 18/12/1920 71 days General  
Gorton Works 15/09/1923 03/11/1923 50 days General
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1926 04/09/1926 92 days General
Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6214
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1928 25/08/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 01/11/1930 22/11/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1958 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1933 01/07/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1935 21/09/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1937 14/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 11/11/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1941 10/01/1942 18 days General
Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1944 22/04/1944 11 days General
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1946 02/11/1946 99 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5086 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1947 15/10/1947 25 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/04/1949 30/04/1949 27 days General
Boiler number 5005 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63777
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1951 11/08/1951 49 days General
Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1951 28/08/1951 15 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 31/07/1953 05/09/1953 37 days General
Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1954 02/10/1954 23 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 06/07/1955 20/08/1955 46 days General
Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1955 03/12/1955 6 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/11/1956 15/12/1956 16 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/06/1957 13/07/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1960 17/11/1960 43 days Heavy Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1214
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19870
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
23/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
13/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/11/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3561    
27/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3777    
20/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
27/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63777 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev