|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/08/1917 | 15/12/1917 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1920 | 18/12/1920 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1923 | 03/11/1923 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1926 | 04/09/1926 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6214 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1928 | 25/08/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1930 | 22/11/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1958 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1933 | 01/07/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1935 | 21/09/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1937 | 14/08/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1939 | 11/11/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1941 | 10/01/1942 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 99 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5086 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1947 | 15/10/1947 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1949 | 30/04/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 5005 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63777 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1951 | 11/08/1951 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1951 | 28/08/1951 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1953 | 05/09/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1954 | 02/10/1954 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1955 | 20/08/1955 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1955 | 03/12/1955 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1957 | 13/07/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1960 | 17/11/1960 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1214 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19870 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
23/09/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
25/08/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1917. Dep: 15/12/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/10/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1920. Dep: 18/12/1920. | ||
15/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1926. Dep: 04/09/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6214 |
||
14/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1928. Dep: 25/08/1928. | ||
01/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1958 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5086 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3561 | ||
27/03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3777 | ||
21/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1947. Dep: 15/10/1947. | ||
04/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1949. Dep: 30/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5005 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63777 |
||
20/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
28/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
24/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/08/1951. Dep: 28/08/1951. | ||
31/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954. | ||
06/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/11/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955. | ||
30/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. | ||
15/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1957. Dep: 13/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/10/1960. Dep: 17/11/1960. | ||
27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63777 from Annesley (16D) |