|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/08/1916 | 30/09/1916 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1527 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1921 | 04/06/1921 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1923 | 02/02/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6215 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1926 | 22/01/1927 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1929 | 01/06/1929 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1931 | 28/03/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1933 | 06/05/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1935 | 30/11/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1938 | 26/03/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1940 | 29/06/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1945 | 28/07/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3562 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1949 | 06/08/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63778 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1952 | 23/02/1952 | 22 days | General | Converted to oil fuel Boiler number 22243 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 042 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1215 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19871 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
23/09/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
12/08/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1916. Dep: 30/09/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1527 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/04/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1921. Dep: 04/06/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 02/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6215 |
||
13/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1926. Dep: 22/01/1927. | ||
09/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 01/06/1929. | ||
04/06/1929 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1881 boiler fitted | ||
04/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
14/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/07/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
12/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
22/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3562 |
||
04/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3778 | ||
02/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63778 |
||
02/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952. Work undertaken: Converted to oil fuel Boiler number 22243 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 042 |
||
22/02/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 042 from Frodingham (36C) |