Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 462 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6073 Week
» 17119 Month
» 17119 Year
» 1682495 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1217 m/e 09/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6217   06/03/1926
War Dept. 736   13/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19873
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 29 yrs , 19 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 736 and sent to Middle East via Swansea 13/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1912
ANN Annesley on 29/09/1912
   Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1483)
10/07/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1858)
14/04/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 865)
22/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 854)
13/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1342)
10/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3298)
08/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 938)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1032)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/05/1920 10/07/1920 50 days General
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1923 15/09/1923 99 days General  
Gorton Works 09/01/1926 06/03/1926 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6217
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1928 14/04/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1930 12/04/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 15/10/1932 22/10/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1935 13/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1937 10/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1939 08/07/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 938 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 20/09/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 1032 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1217
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19873
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
29/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 6217 from Annesley (ANN)    
13/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 736    

prev prev