Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 45 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4764 Week
» 15909 Month
» 115694 Year
» 1781070 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1219 m/e 10/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6219   11/07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3566   10/11/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3799 on 09/02/1947
British Railways 63799 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19875
To Service During 10/1912
Withdrawal Fri 24/11/1961 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 49 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 25/11/61

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1912
ANN   Annesley on 13/11/1912
39A   Gorton on 20/10/1950
39A   Gorton w/e 28/10/1950
36C   Frodingham on 13/06/1954
     Withdrawn on 24/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   on 24/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1485)
03/07/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1430)
27/08/1927 Diagram 105 boiler fitted (number 812)
22/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1009)
27/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1168)
07/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
07/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 487)
02/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 825)
11/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1874)
28/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3308)
10/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 814)
05/04/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1024)
30/04/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3279)
05/05/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22182)
11/07/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22180)
24/12/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22874)
11/10/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22143)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Beyer Peacock Ltd. 20/01/1920 03/07/1920 166 days General Boiler number 1430 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1922 07/10/1922 64 days General    
Gorton Works 02/05/1925 11/07/1925 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6219
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1927 27/08/1927 78 days General Boiler number 812 (Diagram 105)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1929 08/06/1929 36 days General    
Gorton Works 01/08/1931 22/08/1931 22 days General Boiler number 1009 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1934 27/01/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1168 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/02/1936 07/03/1936 8 days General Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1938 02/04/1938 15 days General Chimney altered
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1940 11/05/1940 8 days General Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 14/10/1942 28/11/1942 46 days General Boiler number 3308 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1945 10/03/1945 22 days General Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1947 05/04/1947 29 days General Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1947 06/09/1947 15 days Heavy    
Gorton Works 08/05/1948 29/05/1948 22 days Light Repair Tender only
Renumbered to BR 63799
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1949 30/04/1949 22 days General Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1951 05/05/1951 22 days General Boiler number 22182 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1953 11/07/1953 15 days General Boiler number 22180 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1955 24/12/1955 29 days General Boiler number 22874 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1958 29/03/1958 15 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 13/09/1958 11/10/1958 29 days General Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1219
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19875
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
13/11/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
20/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Beyer Peacock Ltd. (General) - Arr: 20/01/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1430 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1922. Dep: 07/10/1922.    
02/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 11/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6219
   
11/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 27/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 812 (Diagram 105)
   
04/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.    
01/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1931. Dep: 22/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1009 (Diagram 15)
   
13/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1934. Dep: 27/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1168 (Diagram 15)
   
29/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
19/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15)
   
14/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3308 (Diagram 15)
   
17/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
   
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3566    
09/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3799    
08/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
   
23/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/08/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947.    
08/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 29/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
Renumbered to BR 63799
   
09/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1949. Dep: 30/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15)
   
20/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
28/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
14/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22182 (Diagram 15)
   
27/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22180 (Diagram 15)
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
26/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22874 (Diagram 15)
   
15/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958.    
13/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1958. Dep: 11/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63799 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev