|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/06/1918 | 15/07/1918 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/09/1920 | 22/09/1920 | 12 days | Unknown Regime | |||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1923 | 31/01/1923 | 27 days | Unknown Regime | |||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1925 | 28/05/1925 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6220 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1927 | 29/10/1927 | 15 days | Unknown Regime | |||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1929 | 09/11/1929 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1932 | 18/06/1932 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 1073 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1934 | 11/12/1934 | 9 days | General | Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1936 | 12/08/1936 | 3 days | General | Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1938 | 12/10/1938 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 1940 | 08/1940 | General | Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) |
|||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1942 | 10/10/1942 | 96 days | General | Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1945 | 09/06/1945 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5037 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1947 | 13/06/1947 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1948 | 24/01/1948 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1948 | 15/10/1948 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1949 | 15/10/1949 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 5026 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63803 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1952 | 15/03/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1953 | 24/10/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1954 | 24/12/1954 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1955 | 22/10/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1958 | 29/11/1958 | 18 days | Heavy | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1959 | 03/03/1959 | 20 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1961 | 02/06/1961 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28946 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1963 | 22/02/1963 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1220 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19876 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
11/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
12/06/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1918. Dep: 15/07/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/09/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 11/09/1920. Dep: 22/09/1920. | ||
05/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 05/01/1923. Dep: 31/01/1923. | ||
14/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1925. Dep: 28/05/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6220 |
||
15/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927. | ||
02/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1073 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1934. Dep: 11/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1936. Dep: 12/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 12/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) |
||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: ?/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
07/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
10/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) | ||
14/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
24/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5037 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3567 | ||
17/03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3803 | ||
17/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 13/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 24/01/1948. | ||
19/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1948. Dep: 15/10/1948. | ||
25/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5026 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63803 |
||
16/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
01/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1953. Dep: 24/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/12/1954. Dep: 24/12/1954. | ||
24/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
09/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/11/1958. Dep: 29/11/1958. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
12/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/02/1959. Dep: 03/03/1959. | ||
19/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1961. Dep: 02/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28946 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/02/1963. Dep: 22/02/1963. | ||
17/03/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63803 from March (31B) |