Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 709 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6636 Week
» 5374 Month
» 419695 Year
» 1641260 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1223 m/e 10/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6223   22/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3570   16/11/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3570   07/02/1948
British Railways 63570 w/e 29/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/110/1912
O4/702/11/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19879
To Service During 10/1912 to Annesley (ANN)
Withdrawal Fri 22/12/1961 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 49 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley (New) m/e 10/1912
IMM Immingham on 06/06/1929
KEA Keadby on 16/06/1931
FRO Frodingham on 12/06/1932
TUX Tuxford on 05/05/1946
37A Ardsley on 27/09/1953
   Withdrawn on 22/12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   on 22/12/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1489)
12/10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1503)
23/07/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1456)
22/03/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 512)
01/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1160)
02/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1159)
17/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1275)
23/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1854)
18/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3333)
02/11/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3676)
12/06/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3678)
27/10/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3659)
07/02/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3688)
25/06/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3673)
13/10/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22323)
01/08/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22873)
01/02/1958 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22325)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/05/1918 12/10/1918 155 days General
Boiler number 1503 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1920 23/07/1921 276 days General
Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 22/03/1924 50 days General
Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6223
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1926 24/07/1926 92 days General  
Gorton Works 09/02/1929 01/06/1929 113 days General
Boiler number 1160 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1931 02/05/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1159 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1933 17/06/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1935 23/11/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1854 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1938 18/06/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1940 02/11/1940 22 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1943 12/06/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 3678 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1945 27/10/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1948 07/02/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3570
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1948 29/01/1949 30 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63570
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1949 25/06/1949 22 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 3673 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1951 13/10/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22323 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1953 01/08/1953 29 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22873 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1954 22/05/1954 22 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 04/01/1958 01/02/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 22325 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1961 16/12/1961 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1947 WD The Italian State Railways have commenced renumbering the W.D. and U.S.A. locomotives they took over in 1946. Three classes have so far had new numbers allocated to them. The W.D. 2-8-2 Nos. 71016/28/37/8/40/83/4/5/7/9/95/7/8/1100/6/9/10/3/4/9/20/46/8/51/7/66/7/89/91/3, are to become 747.001 to 747.030. No. 71027 taken over in 1946 has apparently been withdrawn. The USA. 2-8-0 Nos. 1650/75/93/6, 1711/6/8/32/4/7/40/1/7/52/3/61/5/7/74/5/82, 1783/5/99, 1851/2/7/8/60/5/6/8/70, 2059/60/6/7/8/9/70/8/9/80/1, 2736-50, 2766-75, 3275-8, 3283-3320, 3322-6, 3328/9/32/4/5/6/7/9/42/8/50, 3380-96, 3405-8, 3411-28, 3430, 3562/8/9/70/1/2, 3611/7/8/9/22/3/40/1, 3660-71, 3685-99, 4418/21/37, 5701/2/31/5/6, 5740-58, 5760/1, 5825/9/34, 5835/44/5, are to become 736.001 to 736.243. Of these up to No. 2081 saw previous service in Algeria and Tunisia. The rest were shipped direct from the U.S.A. to Naples. No. 4418 was noted as Alco. 73410 of 1945. U.S.A. 0-6-OT Nos. 1927/9/30/1 are to become 831.001 to 831.004. No. 1928 has been withdrawn or sold. No mention has yet been made of the renumbering of the Stanier 2-8-0, but it seems more than likely that they will become Nos. 737.001 to 737.015. SLS/194711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1223
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19879
Allocated to Annesley (ANN)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
16/06/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
05/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
16/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3570    
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
22/12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63570 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev