Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 104 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3493 Week
» 22394 Month
» 22394 Year
» 1687770 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1225 m/e 11/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6225   15/08/1925
War Dept. 732   10/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19881
To Service During 11/1912 to Annesley (ANN)
Withdrawal Sun 14/09/1941 off Langwith Junction (LNG)
Service Life 28 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 732 and sent to Middle East via Ellesmere Port 10/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley (New) m/e 11/1912
CLK Colwick on 21/03/1935
LNG Langwith Junction on 14/03/1937
   Withdrawn on 14/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1491)
20/07/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1510)
03/12/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1220)
14/05/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1381)
29/09/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1143)
29/09/1934 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
13/03/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1250)
20/01/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1067)
13/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3369)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Beyer Peacock Ltd. 22/01/1920 20/07/1920 181 days General
Boiler number 1510 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1922 06/01/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 06/06/1925 15/08/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6225
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1927 03/12/1927 29 days General
Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1929 28/12/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 07/05/1932 14/05/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1934 29/09/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1143 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1937 13/03/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1940 20/01/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/09/1941 13/09/1941 8 days General
Boiler number 3369 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1225
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19881
Allocated to Annesley (ANN)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
21/03/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
14/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
14/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 6225 from Langwith Junction (LNG)    
10/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 732    

prev prev