|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beyer Peacock Ltd. | 20/02/1920 | 24/08/1920 | 187 days | General | Boiler number 1857 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1922 | 03/03/1923 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1925 | 02/05/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6227 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1927 | 08/10/1927 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1519 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1928 | 01/12/1928 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1930 | 12/07/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1932 | 02/04/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1935 | 09/03/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1117 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1938 | 22/01/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1940 | 04/01/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1941 | 10/01/1942 | 13 days | Heavy | Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1943 | 08/01/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1948 | 21/08/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63574 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1951 | 18/08/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22209 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1954 | 03/04/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22230 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1957 | 11/05/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1227 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19883 Allocated to Annesley (ANN) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
20/02/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Beyer Peacock Ltd. (General) - Arr: 20/02/1920. Dep: 24/08/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1857 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1922. Dep: 03/03/1923. | ||
28/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 02/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6227 |
||
13/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1519 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1928. Dep: 01/12/1928. | ||
09/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
21/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1930. Dep: 12/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/04/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
02/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1117 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 22/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/12/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
16/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3574 | ||
24/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63574 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
04/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1951. Dep: 18/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22209 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1954. Dep: 03/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22230 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1957. Dep: 11/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63574 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |