|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/08/1917 | 17/11/1917 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1467 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1920 | 07/10/1920 | 104 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1923 | 13/09/1923 | 83 days | General | Boiler number 1435 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1926 | 22/04/1926 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6229 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1929 | 14/05/1929 | 81 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1931 | 06/08/1931 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1933 | 30/12/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1935 | 25/01/1936 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1938 | 06/05/1938 | 44 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1940 | 27/07/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1943 | 06/02/1943 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1944 | 17/02/1945 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1946 | 15/05/1947 | 236 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3576 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1950 | 29/04/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63576 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1950 | 13/05/1950 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1952 | 02/08/1952 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 22280 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1952 | 13/08/1952 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1954 | 22/01/1955 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1957 | 08/02/1958 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 22881 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1958 | 24/02/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1961 | 03/05/1961 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1229 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19885 Allocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
04/08/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1917. Dep: 17/11/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1467 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/06/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1920. Dep: 07/10/1920. | ||
23/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1923. Dep: 13/09/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1435 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1926. Dep: 22/04/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6229 |
||
23/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1929. Dep: 14/05/1929. | ||
13/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 06/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1933. Dep: 30/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
30/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 25/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
24/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1938. Dep: 06/05/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/04/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1943. Dep: 06/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
29/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1944. Dep: 17/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
22/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1946. Dep: 15/05/1947. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3576 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
02/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1950. Dep: 29/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63576 |
||
03/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950. | ||
14/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1952. Dep: 02/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22280 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1952. Dep: 13/08/1952. | ||
23/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952. | ||
02/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1957. Dep: 08/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22881 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1958. Dep: 24/02/1958. | ||
24/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/03/1961. Dep: 03/05/1961. | ||
29/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63576 from Frodingham (36C) |