Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 42 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1879 Week
» 13024 Month
» 112809 Year
» 1778185 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1229 m/e 11/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6229   22/04/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3576   09/12/1946
British Railways 63576 w/e 06/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19885
To Service During 11/1912 to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Withdrawal Fri 29/11/1963 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 51 yrs , 29 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 1/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
STV   Staveley (G.C.) (New) m/e 11/1912
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 26/01/1934
DON   Doncaster on 17/04/1941
CLK   Colwick on 06/09/1943
DON   Doncaster on 23/01/1944
ARD   Ardsley on 11/06/1944
MEX   Mexborough on 18/08/1946
FRO   Frodingham on 07/08/1949
FRO   Frodingham w/e 13/08/1949
     Withdrawn on 29/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 13/08/1949
WDN   on 29/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1495)
17/11/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1467)
13/09/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1435)
22/04/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1116)
06/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1883)
30/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1338)
25/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3230)
25/01/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
06/05/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3212)
27/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3318)
06/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3297)
17/02/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3213)
29/04/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3386)
02/08/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22280)
22/01/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22264)
08/02/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22881)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 04/08/1917 17/11/1917 106 days General Boiler number 1467 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1920 07/10/1920 104 days General    
Gorton Works 23/06/1923 13/09/1923 83 days General Boiler number 1435 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1926 22/04/1926 63 days General Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6229
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1929 14/05/1929 81 days General    
Gorton Works 13/06/1931 06/08/1931 55 days General Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1933 30/12/1933 37 days General Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1935 25/01/1936 57 days General Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1938 06/05/1938 44 days General Chimney altered
Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1940 27/07/1940 25 days General Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1943 06/02/1943 35 days General Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1944 17/02/1945 51 days General Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1946 15/05/1947 236 days General Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3576
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1950 29/04/1950 28 days General Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63576
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1950 13/05/1950 11 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 14/06/1952 02/08/1952 50 days General Boiler number 22280 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1952 13/08/1952 7 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 23/11/1952 13/12/1952 21 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 02/12/1954 22/01/1955 52 days General Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1957 08/02/1958 75 days General Boiler number 22881 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1958 24/02/1958 3 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 24/03/1961 03/05/1961 41 days Heavy Intermediate    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1229
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19885
Allocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/08/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1917. Dep: 17/11/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1467 (Diagram 15)
   
26/06/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1920. Dep: 07/10/1920.    
23/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1923. Dep: 13/09/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1435 (Diagram 15)
   
19/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1926. Dep: 22/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6229
   
23/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1929. Dep: 14/05/1929.    
13/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 06/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1933. Dep: 30/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15)
   
26/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
30/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 25/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
24/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1938. Dep: 06/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15)
   
03/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15)
   
17/04/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1943. Dep: 06/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15)
   
06/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
11/06/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
29/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1944. Dep: 17/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
22/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1946. Dep: 15/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3576
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
02/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1950. Dep: 29/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63576
   
03/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950.    
14/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1952. Dep: 02/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22280 (Diagram 15)
   
07/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1952. Dep: 13/08/1952.    
23/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952.    
02/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15)
   
26/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1957. Dep: 08/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22881 (Diagram 15)
   
22/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1958. Dep: 24/02/1958.    
24/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/03/1961. Dep: 03/05/1961.    
29/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63576 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev