Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 983 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6479 Week
» 25380 Month
» 25380 Year
» 1690756 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1233 m/e 11/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6233   05/12/1925
War Dept. 747   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19889
To Service During 11/1912 to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Service Life 28 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 747 and sent to Middle East via Ellesmere Port 17/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STV Staveley (G.C.) (New) m/e 11/1912
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 01/02/1934
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 19/02/1934
   Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1499)
01/05/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1850)
05/12/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1079)
11/10/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1165)
10/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1119)
13/04/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1165)
03/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3282)
08/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3285)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3388)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/02/1920 01/05/1920 71 days General
Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1922 13/01/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 10/10/1925 05/12/1925 57 days General
Boiler number 1079 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6233
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1928 21/07/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 06/09/1930 11/10/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1932 10/12/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1119 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1935 13/04/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1937 03/04/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3282 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1939 08/07/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1941 27/09/1941 17 days General
Boiler number 3388 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 747
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1233
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19889
Allocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
19/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 747 from Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    

prev prev