Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 881 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6492 Week
» 17538 Month
» 17538 Year
» 1682914 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1235 m/e 11/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6235   17/01/1925
War Dept. 773   04/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19891
To Service During 11/1912
Withdrawal Sat 04/10/1941 off Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 773 and sent to Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1912
STV Staveley (G.C.) on 15/11/1919
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 29/01/1934
   Withdrawn on 04/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1501)
21/12/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1774)
04/02/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1470)
17/01/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1511)
19/04/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1188)
24/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1277)
15/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 809)
12/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3295)
04/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3354)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/08/1918 21/12/1918 141 days General
Boiler number 1774 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1922 04/02/1922 29 days General
Boiler number 1470 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1924 17/01/1925 120 days General
Boiler number 1511 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6235
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1928 05/05/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 29/03/1930 19/04/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1932 24/12/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1277 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1935 15/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1937 12/06/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 3295 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 18/11/1939 22 days General  
Gorton Works 22/09/1941 04/10/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3354 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 773
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1235
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19891
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
29/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
04/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 773 from Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    

prev prev