Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 98 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5573 Week
» 5573 Month
» 72435 Year
» 1737811 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1236 m/e 11/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6236   13/03/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3583   03/11/1946
British Railways 63583 w/e 07/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19892
To Service During 11/1912
Withdrawal Tue 30/06/1959 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Service Life 46 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 7/59

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1912
STV   Staveley (G.C.) on 15/11/1919
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 24/01/1934
91W   To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 23/11/1940
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 30/04/1941
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
     Withdrawn on 30/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 30/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1502)
01/02/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1497)
10/11/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1758)
13/03/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1433)
08/12/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 42)
31/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1111)
15/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 946)
09/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3219)
19/02/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
19/02/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3222)
17/08/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3330)
10/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3228)
04/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1271)
30/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22114)
07/02/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22170)
03/03/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22100)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 16/11/1918 01/02/1919 78 days General Boiler number 1497 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1921 23/04/1921 43 days General    
Gorton Works 22/09/1923 10/11/1923 50 days General Boiler number 1758 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1926 13/03/1926 64 days General Boiler number 1433 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6236
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1928 08/12/1928 71 days General Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1931 31/01/1931 15 days General Boiler number 1111 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1933 15/07/1933 15 days General Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1935 09/11/1935 8 days General Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1938 19/02/1938 8 days General Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1940 17/08/1940 8 days General Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1943 10/04/1943 11 days General Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1947 04/10/1947 22 days General Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1950 30/09/1950 15 days General Boiler number 22114 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63583
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1953 07/02/1953 15 days General Boiler number 22170 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1954 24/04/1954 15 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 11/02/1956 03/03/1956 22 days General Boiler number 22100 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1236
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19892
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/11/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1918. Dep: 01/02/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1497 (Diagram 15)
   
15/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
12/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1921. Dep: 23/04/1921.    
22/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1923. Dep: 10/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1758 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1926. Dep: 13/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1433 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6236
   
29/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1928. Dep: 08/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
   
17/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1931. Dep: 31/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1111 (Diagram 15)
   
01/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1933. Dep: 15/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
   
24/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
02/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1935. Dep: 09/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15)
   
12/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
10/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
30/04/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
31/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3583    
13/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1947. Dep: 04/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22114 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63583
   
24/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22170 (Diagram 15)
   
10/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1954. Dep: 24/04/1954.    
11/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1956. Dep: 03/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22100 (Diagram 15)
   
30/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63583 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev