|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/03/1918 | 20/07/1918 | 134 days | General | Boiler number 1743 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1920 | 03/07/1920 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1922 | 04/11/1922 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1924 | 14/02/1925 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6237 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/09/1926 | 20/11/1926 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1928 | 09/02/1929 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1306 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1930 | 11/10/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1932 | 17/12/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1302 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1935 | 18/05/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1939 | 09/12/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1942 | 01/08/1942 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1950 | 28/01/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63584 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1952 | 08/11/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22876 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1955 | 31/12/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1960 | 18/06/1960 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1960 | 30/07/1960 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1960 | 06/08/1960 | 8 days | Light Casual | After collision Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1237 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19893 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
01/11/1914 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/03/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1918. Dep: 20/07/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1743 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/05/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920. | ||
26/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1922. Dep: 04/11/1922. | ||
20/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1924. Dep: 14/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6237 |
||
11/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1926. Dep: 20/11/1926. | ||
03/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1306 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1930. Dep: 11/10/1930. | ||
22/12/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
12/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
03/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1932. Dep: 17/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1302 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3584 | ||
17/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1950. Dep: 28/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63584 |
||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
25/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22876 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
26/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1955. Dep: 31/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1960. Dep: 30/07/1960. | ||
30/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1960. Dep: 06/08/1960. Work undertaken: After collision Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
08/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63584 from Ardsley (56B) |