Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 443 Today
» 642 Yesterday
» 4767 Week
» 11475 Month
» 164428 Year
» 1829804 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1238 m/e 12/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6238   17/07/1926
War Dept. 761   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19894
To Service During 12/1912
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 28 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 761 and sent to Middle East

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1912
ANN   Annesley on 17/03/1915
     Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1504)
19/09/1916 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1636)
05/02/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1871)
08/12/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1467)
08/12/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1161)
14/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1469)
30/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1198)
18/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1193)
18/01/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
25/12/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3311)
25/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1121)
04/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 866)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 10/06/1916 19/09/1916 102 days General Boiler number 1636 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1921 05/02/1921 29 days General Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1923 08/12/1923 57 days General Boiler number 1467 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1926 17/07/1926 85 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6238
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1928 08/12/1928 99 days General Boiler number 1161 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1931 14/03/1931 22 days General Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1933 30/09/1933 8 days General Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1935 18/01/1936 59 days General Boiler number 1193 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1937 25/12/1937 8 days General Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1939 25/11/1939 15 days General Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1941 04/10/1941 13 days General Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1238
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19894
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
17/03/1915 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
10/06/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1916. Dep: 19/09/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1636 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1921. Dep: 05/02/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1923. Dep: 08/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1467 (Diagram 15)
   
24/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1926. Dep: 17/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6238
   
01/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1928. Dep: 08/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1161 (Diagram 15)
   
21/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 14/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 30/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1193 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
18/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1937. Dep: 25/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15)
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 761 from Annesley (ANN)    
19/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 761    
22/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15)
   

prev prev