|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/07/1917 | 29/09/1917 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1477 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1921 | 11/02/1922 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1924 | 23/02/1924 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6242 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1925 | 13/02/1926 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1928 | 12/05/1928 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1930 | 22/02/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1932 | 01/10/1932 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1934 | 18/08/1934 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1936 | 17/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1938 | 22/10/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1941 | 23/08/1941 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22344 (Diagram 15A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3589 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1949 | 28/04/1949 | 104 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5109 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63589 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1950 | 09/02/1951 | 90 days | General | Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1953 | 21/02/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 28840 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1955 | 05/02/1955 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28855 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1959 | 12/12/1959 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1962 | 30/11/1962 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 28957 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1242 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19898 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1917. Dep: 29/09/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1477 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/12/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1921. Dep: 11/02/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
05/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 23/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6242 |
||
12/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1925. Dep: 13/02/1926. | ||
14/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1928. Dep: 12/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
12/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
03/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 01/10/1932. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A) |
||
21/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934. | ||
03/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A) |
||
01/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15A) |
||
22/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
30/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
01/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A) |
||
04/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A) |
||
24/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22344 (Diagram 15A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3589 |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
20/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
13/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
15/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1949. Dep: 28/04/1949. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5109 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63589 |
||
30/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
12/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1950. Dep: 09/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1953. Dep: 21/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28840 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1955. Dep: 05/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28855 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
16/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1959. Dep: 12/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1962. Dep: 30/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28957 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
11/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63589 from Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
25/10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |