Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 75 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 75 Week
» 11220 Month
» 111005 Year
» 1776381 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1246 m/e 12/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6246   02/04/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3593   29/11/1946
British Railways 63593 w/e 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19902
To Service During 12/1912 to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Withdrawal Sun 03/10/1965 off Doncaster (36A)
Service Life 52 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 11/65

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend (New) m/e 12/1912
IMM   Immingham on 26/03/1924
MAR   March on 04/07/1925
IMM   Immingham on 09/07/1925
LNG   Langwith Junction on 27/10/1927
CLK   Colwick on 25/02/1935
DON   Doncaster on 23/01/1944
40B   Immingham on 25/06/1950
40B   Immingham m/e 30/06/1950
36B   Mexborough on 09/12/1951
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 29/12/1951
36C   Frodingham on 05/11/1961
36A   Doncaster on 12/11/1961
     Withdrawn on 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1512)
11/05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1535)
02/04/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1262)
04/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1749)
15/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1220)
18/05/1934 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/05/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1129)
18/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3254)
31/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 486)
01/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3320)
28/08/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3326)
22/12/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3237)
26/06/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3335)
13/01/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22154)
07/11/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22164)
27/04/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22228)
25/03/1961 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22287)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 26/01/1918 11/05/1918 106 days General Boiler number 1535 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1922 09/10/1922 80 days General    
Gorton Works 13/02/1925 02/04/1925 49 days General Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6246
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1927 08/10/1927 50 days General    
Gorton Works 20/01/1930 04/03/1930 44 days General Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1932 15/07/1932 45 days General Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1934 18/05/1934 33 days General Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1936 18/07/1936 19 days General Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1938 31/12/1938 58 days General Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1941 01/03/1941 24 days General Boiler number 3320 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1943 28/08/1943 38 days General Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1945 22/12/1945 53 days General Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1946 30/11/1946 54 days General Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3593
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1948 26/06/1948 28 days General Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63593
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1950 13/01/1951 33 days General Boiler number 22154 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1951 22/01/1951 6 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 13/10/1953 07/11/1953 26 days General Boiler number 22164 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1957 27/04/1957 37 days General Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1961 25/03/1961 37 days General Boiler number 22287 (Diagram 15)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/10/1965 Doncaster Shed (Stored) Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. SLS/196511

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1246
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19902
Allocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
26/01/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1918. Dep: 11/05/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1535 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1922. Dep: 09/10/1922.    
26/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
13/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1925. Dep: 02/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6246
   
04/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
09/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
20/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927.    
27/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
20/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1930. Dep: 04/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15)
   
01/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1932. Dep: 15/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15)
   
16/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1934. Dep: 18/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
25/02/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15)
   
04/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15)
   
06/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3320 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
31/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1945. Dep: 22/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
   
08/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3593
   
30/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1948. Dep: 26/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63593
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1950. Dep: 13/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22154 (Diagram 15)
   
17/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1951. Dep: 22/01/1951.    
09/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
13/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22164 (Diagram 15)
   
22/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1957. Dep: 27/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15)
   
17/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22287 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
12/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
03/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63593 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev