Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 976 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2148 Week
» 21049 Month
» 21049 Year
» 1686425 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1247 m/e 12/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6247   21/03/1925
War Dept. 774   04/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19903
To Service During 12/1912 to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Withdrawal Sat 04/10/1941 off Woodford Halse (WFD)
Service Life 28 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 774 and sent to Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend (New) m/e 12/1912
IMM Immingham on 24/02/1924
WFD Woodford Halse on 17/10/1929
   Withdrawn on 04/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1513)
14/10/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1476)
21/03/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1367)
14/09/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1961)
23/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1011)
23/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 805)
20/04/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 872)
03/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3280)
19/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3375)
04/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3286)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/07/1922 14/10/1922 85 days General
Boiler number 1476 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1925 21/03/1925 36 days General
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6247
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1927 25/06/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 03/08/1929 14/09/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1931 23/05/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1011 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1933 23/09/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1935 20/04/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1937 03/04/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3280 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1939 19/08/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3375 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1941 04/10/1941 11 days General
Boiler number 3286 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 774
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1247
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19903
Allocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
24/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
17/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
04/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 774 from Woodford Halse (WFD)    

prev prev