Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 96 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 96 Week
» 26717 Month
» 26717 Year
» 1692093 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1252 m/e 01/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6252   29/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3599   24/12/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3599   28/02/1948
British Railways 63599 w/e 26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19908
To Service During 01/1913
Withdrawal Fri 09/02/1962 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 49 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 10/2/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1913
IMM Immingham on 17/11/1922
MEX Mexborough on 02/02/1923
CLK Colwick on 18/09/1944
ANN Annesley on 11/04/1948
CLK Colwick on 08/01/1950
39A Gorton on 23/04/1950
38A Colwick on 13/06/1954
39B Sheffield Darnall on 18/07/1954
   Withdrawn on 09/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLX   w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 23/04/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 14/08/1954
WDN   on 09/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1518)
28/04/1917 Diagram 15Sat boiler fitted (number 1181)
06/09/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1600)
10/12/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1436)
29/03/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 455)
30/08/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1368)
17/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1418)
23/05/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
23/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1873)
15/04/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 929)
24/05/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1270)
11/12/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 588)
19/10/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3409)
26/02/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1020)
04/08/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22204)
15/08/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22211)
16/06/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22297)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/12/1916 28/04/1917 134 days General
Saturated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1919 06/09/1919 29 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1921 10/12/1921 99 days General
Boiler number 1436 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 29/03/1924 50 days General
Boiler number 455 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6252
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1926 31/12/1926 56 days General  
Gorton Works 05/05/1928 30/06/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 02/08/1930 30/08/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1933 17/06/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1418 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1936 23/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1939 15/04/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1941 24/05/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1943 11/12/1943 22 days General
Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1946 19/10/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3409 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1947 29/11/1947 22 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 26/01/1948 28/02/1948 34 days Light Repair
After collision
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3599
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1949 26/02/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63599
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1951 04/08/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22204 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1953 15/08/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22211 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1956 16/06/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22297 (Diagram 15)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 Crewe - Smoke deflectors Smoke deflectors are being fitted to all the non-streamlined Princess Coronation locos in the same way as with 6232/52. 6234/3/50 have so far been so treated. SLS/194605
30/03/1946 W.D. ENGINES IN HOLLAND The initials N.S. indicates Nederlandsche Spoorwegen, i.e. Netherlands Railways: this being not a State to concern but a limited liability company. Reference to the Netherlands State Railways is thus incorrect.
Another point is that all W.D. locos in Holland are on to loan and have not been purchased. They still have their W.D. numbers in addition to their N.S numbers.
Six more 0-6-0 saddle tanks are on loan:-N.S. 8822 to 8827, W.D. 75026/53/86, 75104/15/99.
The 2-8-0's (W.D. 77125, 77238) which were allotted N.S. 4528/9 were in an accident last August, and were sent to Malines Works in Belgium. After overhaul, they went to to Western Germany, and so never bore their N.S. numbers. Ten more W.D. 2 8 0's went to the N.S. on loan in January, 1946:-N.S. 4528 to 4537, W.D. 77009/10, 77193/4/7, 77011/38, 77188/90, 77358. Of these, 77193/4/7 came from the Dutch State Mines in Limburg. At the same time N.S. 4511 (W.D. 79196) went to the State Mines (S.M.), while N.S. 4504/9 (W.D. 78677 and 79189) left for Belgium. These three locos. are no longer on the N.S. list. W.D. 77193 was S.M. 62.
Also noted S.M. 74 (W.D. 75002).
Sixty 2-10-0's are on loan to the N.S. from January, 1946:-N.S. 5001 to 5060: W.D. 73650/61/2/4-71/3/5/6/9-81/9-93/5-9, 73700/1/4-7/9/11-3/5/7-22/7/9/32-4/6-41/4/5/7-9.
SLS/194605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1913 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1252
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19908
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
17/11/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
02/02/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3599    
11/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
18/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
09/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63599 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev