|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/09/1917 | 09/03/1918 | 169 days | General | Boiler number 1515 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1920 | 30/10/1920 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1923 | 02/06/1923 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1925 | 23/01/1926 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5375 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1928 | 09/06/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1930 | 30/08/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1933 | 28/01/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1296 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1935 | 01/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1937 | 04/09/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1939 | 18/11/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1941 | 11/10/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3359 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 768 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 375 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
24/07/1915 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
22/09/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1917. Dep: 09/03/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1515 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/09/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1920. Dep: 30/10/1920. | ||
17/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1923. Dep: 02/06/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1925. Dep: 23/01/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5375 |
||
28/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 09/06/1928. | ||
02/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 30/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 28/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1296 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 01/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3359 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 768 |
||
11/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 768 from Annesley (ANN) |