Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 75 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3493 Week
» 28327 Month
» 62659 Year
» 1728035 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 376 m/e 04/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5376   20/06/1925
War Dept. 763   10/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 413
To Service During 04/1913
Withdrawal Wed 10/09/1941 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 28 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 763 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1913
MEX   Mexborough on 05/04/1919
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1536)
30/11/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1773)
23/07/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1480)
18/08/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1940)
31/12/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1381)
15/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1851)
29/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1108)
12/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1374)
26/03/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
26/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3320)
15/02/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3342)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 24/08/1918 30/11/1918 99 days General Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1921 23/07/1921 36 days General Boiler number 1480 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1923 18/08/1923 64 days General Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1925 20/06/1925 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5376
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1927 31/12/1927 43 days General Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1930 15/03/1930 22 days General Boiler number 1851 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1932 29/10/1932 15 days General Boiler number 1108 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1935 12/10/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1938 26/03/1938 15 days General Boiler number 3320 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1941 15/02/1941 8 days General Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1913 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 376
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
24/08/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1918. Dep: 30/11/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1921. Dep: 23/07/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1480 (Diagram 15)
   
16/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1923. Dep: 18/08/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15)
   
18/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5376
   
19/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 31/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15)
   
22/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 15/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1851 (Diagram 15)
   
15/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1932. Dep: 29/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1108 (Diagram 15)
   
28/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15)
   
12/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3320 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
08/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 15/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 15)
   
10/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 763 from Mexborough (MEX)    
10/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 763    

prev prev