|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 24/08/1918 | 30/11/1918 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1921 | 23/07/1921 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1480 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1923 | 18/08/1923 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1925 | 20/06/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5376 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1927 | 31/12/1927 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1930 | 15/03/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1851 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1932 | 29/10/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1108 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1935 | 12/10/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1938 | 26/03/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3320 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1941 | 15/02/1941 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 376 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
24/08/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1918. Dep: 30/11/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/04/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
18/06/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1921. Dep: 23/07/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1480 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1923. Dep: 18/08/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5376 |
||
19/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 31/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 15/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1851 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1932. Dep: 29/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1108 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3320 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
08/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 15/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 763 from Mexborough (MEX) | ||
10/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 763 |