Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 34 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2832 Week
» 14514 Month
» 167467 Year
» 1832843 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 379 m/e 06/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5379   22/05/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3604   16/11/1946
British Railways 63604 w/e 24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/106/1913
O4/8 (2-8-0)16/01/1954
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 413
To Service During 06/1913
Withdrawal Fri 01/05/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Service Life 50 yrs, 11 mths , 0 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Hesslewoods (Attercliffe)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to W Hesslewood, Attercliffe, 6/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1913
GOR   Gorton on 18/11/1921
IMM   Immingham on 06/01/1924
TUX   Tuxford on 20/05/1937
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 06/03/1949
SHF   Sheffield Darnall w/e 12/03/1949
41H   Staveley (G.C.) on 02/12/1962
     Withdrawn on 01/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 2w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   on 01/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1539)
30/06/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1692)
19/05/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 111)
22/05/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1867)
29/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1175)
10/02/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1035)
05/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 930)
15/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3347)
15/10/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
04/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3201)
31/07/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 856)
23/02/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3305)
26/04/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3269)
09/06/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22191)
16/01/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28847)
30/03/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28929)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 17/02/1917 30/06/1917 134 days General Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1920 05/11/1920 91 days General    
Gorton Works 27/01/1923 19/05/1923 113 days General Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1926 22/05/1926 83 days General Boiler number 1867 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5379
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1927 13/04/1927 68 days General    
Gorton Works 08/04/1929 18/06/1929 72 days General    
Gorton Works 01/08/1931 29/08/1931 29 days General Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1934 10/02/1934 34 days General Boiler number 1035 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1936 05/09/1936 23 days General Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1938 15/10/1938 50 days General Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1938 30/10/1938 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 24/11/1940 04/01/1941 42 days General Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1943 31/07/1943 28 days General Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1945 23/02/1946 62 days General Boiler number 3305 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1948 26/04/1948 42 days General Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63604
 
Gorton Works 15/05/1951 09/06/1951 26 days General Boiler number 22191 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1951 20/06/1951 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 23/11/1953 16/01/1954 55 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28847 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1957 30/03/1957 51 days General Boiler number 28929 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/09/1961 14/10/1961 38 days General    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1913 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 379
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
17/02/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1917. Dep: 30/06/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15)
   
07/08/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1920. Dep: 05/11/1920.    
18/11/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1923. Dep: 19/05/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
01/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1926. Dep: 22/05/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1867 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5379
   
05/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1927. Dep: 13/04/1927.    
08/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1929. Dep: 18/06/1929.    
01/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1035 (Diagram 15)
   
14/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
   
20/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
27/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
29/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 30/10/1938.    
24/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
   
04/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
   
24/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1945. Dep: 23/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3305 (Diagram 15)
   
16/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3604    
16/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1948. Dep: 26/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63604
   
06/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
15/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1951. Dep: 09/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22191 (Diagram 15)
   
19/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1951. Dep: 20/06/1951.    
23/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28847 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28929 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961.    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
01/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63604 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev