|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/07/1917 | 22/09/1917 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1506 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1920 | 23/10/1920 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1923 | 01/12/1923 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1925 | 05/12/1925 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1076 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5380 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1929 | 03/08/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1932 | 30/01/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1934 | 26/05/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1936 | 11/04/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1940 | 06/07/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/11/1942 | 24/12/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1944 | 16/09/1944 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1948 | 10/04/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63605 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1949 | 24/09/1949 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1950 | 04/11/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1953 | 28/02/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22894 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22152 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1959 | 22/08/1959 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 380 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1917. Dep: 22/09/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1506 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1917 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
07/08/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1920. Dep: 23/10/1920. | ||
13/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1923. Dep: 01/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
10/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1925. Dep: 05/12/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1076 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5380 |
||
14/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
06/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1929. Dep: 03/08/1929. | ||
23/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1932. Dep: 30/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1934. Dep: 26/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1936. Dep: 11/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
02/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1942. Dep: 24/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3605 | ||
29/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
13/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63605 |
||
09/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
06/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1949. Dep: 24/09/1949. | ||
21/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1950. Dep: 04/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22894 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
21/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22152 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1959. Dep: 22/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63605 from Ardsley (56B) |