Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 77 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3495 Week
» 28329 Month
» 62661 Year
» 1728037 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 383 m/e 08/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5383   08/08/1925
War Dept. 711   10/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 413
To Service During 08/1913
Withdrawal Wed 10/09/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 28 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 711 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow 15/9/41

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1913
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 13/11/1920
ANN   Annesley on 27/03/1924
CLK   Colwick on 31/03/1924
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1543)
09/12/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1498)
29/09/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 930)
04/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1086)
13/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1416)
15/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1947)
15/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
17/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1265)
24/05/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1957)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 30/09/1922 09/12/1922 71 days General Boiler number 1498 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1925 08/08/1925 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5383
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1927 30/06/1927 6 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 07/07/1928 29/09/1928 85 days General Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1931 04/07/1931 22 days General Boiler number 1086 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1934 13/01/1934 8 days General Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1936 15/08/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1938 17/12/1938 15 days General Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1941 24/05/1941 22 days General Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1913 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 383
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
13/11/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
30/09/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1922. Dep: 09/12/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1498 (Diagram 15)
   
27/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
31/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
06/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 08/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5383
   
25/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 30/06/1927.    
07/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
   
13/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1086 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1934. Dep: 13/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15)
   
01/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
03/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1938. Dep: 17/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15)
   
03/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
   
10/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 711 from Colwick (CLK)    
10/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 711    

prev prev