Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 957 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6568 Week
» 17614 Month
» 17614 Year
» 1682990 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 385 m/e 12/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5385   01/05/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3610   27/10/1946
British Railways 63610 w/e 16/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/112/1913
O1 (2-8-0)29/07/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 12/1913
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 48 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 1/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1913
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 14/03/1914
ANN Annesley on 29/03/1924
CLK Colwick on 05/04/1924
DON Doncaster on 23/01/1944
THJ Thornton Junction on 20/08/1944
ANN Annesley on 23/01/1949
   Withdrawn w/e 24/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 29/01/1949
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 24/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 768)
12/11/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1947)
06/07/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 932)
31/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1964)
22/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1368)
05/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3210)
29/01/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3313)
08/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3319)
12/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 865)
29/07/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5005)
21/09/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5004)
16/04/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5096)
16/04/1949 Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
25/08/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28340)
20/06/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28314)
25/06/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28284)
19/10/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28883)
19/10/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28805)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/10/1921 12/11/1921 43 days General
Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1923 19/01/1924 64 days General  
Gorton Works 20/02/1926 01/05/1926 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5385
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1929 06/07/1929 78 days General
Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1929 10/08/1929 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 10/01/1931 31/01/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1933 22/07/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1935 05/10/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1938 29/01/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1940 08/06/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1942 12/09/1942 13 days General
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1944 29/07/1944 78 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5005 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1946 21/09/1946 47 days General
Boiler number 5004 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1949 16/04/1949 28 days General
Boiler number 5096 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63610
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1950 04/06/1950 61 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 19/07/1951 25/08/1951 38 days General
Boiler number 28340 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1951 25/09/1951 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 09/10/1951 13/10/1951 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/06/1953 20/06/1953 18 days General
Boiler number 28314 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1954 25/09/1954 26 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 11/05/1955 25/06/1955 46 days General
Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1956 28/07/1956 57 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 13/02/1957 02/03/1957 18 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 17/09/1957 19/10/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 28883 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1959 18/11/1959 30 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 05/09/1962 19/10/1962 45 days General
Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1913 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 385
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
14/03/1914 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
29/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
20/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3610    
23/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
24/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63610 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev