Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 33 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1943 Week
» 2882 Month
» 206372 Year
» 1871748 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 386 m/e 01/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5386   26/01/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3611   10/10/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3611   15/03/1948
British Railways 63611 w/e 10/02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 01/1914
Withdrawal Thu 26/03/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Service Life 50 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Killamarsh, 6/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1914
MEX   Mexborough on 30/03/1917
41H   Staveley (G.C.) on 26/05/1963
     Withdrawn on 26/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/06/1963
WDN   on 26/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 784)
25/08/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1495)
28/08/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1484)
26/01/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1960)
13/12/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1886)
28/04/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1317)
17/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1888)
31/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3266)
31/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
16/09/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 860)
14/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3300)
10/11/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1281)
15/03/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 871)
10/02/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22160)
23/01/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22213)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 20/05/1922 25/08/1922 98 days General Boiler number 1495 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1923 28/08/1923 60 days General Boiler number 1484 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1925 26/01/1926 56 days General Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5386
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1928 13/12/1928 100 days General Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1931 28/04/1931 67 days General Boiler number 1317 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1934 17/03/1934 33 days General Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1936 31/10/1936 34 days General Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1939 16/09/1939 37 days General Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1942 14/11/1942 23 days General Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1945 10/11/1945 58 days General Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1948 15/03/1948 35 days General Boiler number 871 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3611
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1951 10/02/1951 31 days General Boiler number 22160 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63611
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1951 20/02/1951 5 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 19/12/1953 23/01/1954 36 days General Boiler number 22213 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1954 28/01/1954 3 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 25/03/1958 10/05/1958 47 days General    
Gorton Works 19/05/1958 08/06/1958 21 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 27/04/1961 19/05/1961 23 days Light Casual    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1947 WD The Italian State Railways have commenced renumbering the W.D. and U.S.A. locomotives they took over in 1946. Three classes have so far had new numbers allocated to them. The W.D. 2-8-2 Nos. 71016/28/37/8/40/83/4/5/7/9/95/7/8/1100/6/9/10/3/4/9/20/46/8/51/7/66/7/89/91/3, are to become 747.001 to 747.030. No. 71027 taken over in 1946 has apparently been withdrawn. The USA. 2-8-0 Nos. 1650/75/93/6, 1711/6/8/32/4/7/40/1/7/52/3/61/5/7/74/5/82, 1783/5/99, 1851/2/7/8/60/5/6/8/70, 2059/60/6/7/8/9/70/8/9/80/1, 2736-50, 2766-75, 3275-8, 3283-3320, 3322-6, 3328/9/32/4/5/6/7/9/42/8/50, 3380-96, 3405-8, 3411-28, 3430, 3562/8/9/70/1/2, 3611/7/8/9/22/3/40/1, 3660-71, 3685-99, 4418/21/37, 5701/2/31/5/6, 5740-58, 5760/1, 5825/9/34, 5835/44/5, are to become 736.001 to 736.243. Of these up to No. 2081 saw previous service in Algeria and Tunisia. The rest were shipped direct from the U.S.A. to Naples. No. 4418 was noted as Alco. 73410 of 1945. U.S.A. 0-6-OT Nos. 1927/9/30/1 are to become 831.001 to 831.004. No. 1928 has been withdrawn or sold. No mention has yet been made of the renumbering of the Stanier 2-8-0, but it seems more than likely that they will become Nos. 737.001 to 737.015. SLS/194711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 386
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/03/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
20/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1922. Dep: 25/08/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1495 (Diagram 15)
   
30/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1923. Dep: 28/08/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1484 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1925. Dep: 26/01/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5386
   
05/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1928. Dep: 13/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15)
   
21/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 28/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1317 (Diagram 15)
   
13/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15)
   
28/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
11/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1939. Dep: 16/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
   
23/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
   
10/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3611    
10/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1948. Dep: 15/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 871 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3611
   
11/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22160 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63611
   
16/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1951. Dep: 20/02/1951.    
19/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22213 (Diagram 15)
   
26/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/01/1954. Dep: 28/01/1954.    
25/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1958. Dep: 10/05/1958.    
19/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1958. Dep: 08/06/1958.    
27/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/04/1961. Dep: 19/05/1961.    
26/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
26/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63611 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev