|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 31/01/1920 | 08/05/1920 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1922 | 23/09/1922 | 99 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1924 | 17/05/1924 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1479 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5392 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1926 | 10/04/1926 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1928 | 13/10/1928 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1930 | 20/12/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1966 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1933 | 20/05/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1935 | 25/05/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1937 | 10/04/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1939 | 23/09/1939 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 3431 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 746 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 392 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Mexborough (MEX) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
31/01/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1920. Dep: 08/05/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/06/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1922. Dep: 23/09/1922. | ||
22/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1479 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5392 |
||
13/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1926. Dep: 10/04/1926. | ||
28/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
29/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 20/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1966 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 20/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
03/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1939. Dep: 23/09/1939. | ||
10/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3431 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 746 |
||
19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 746 from March (MAR) |