|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/02/1922 | 16/05/1922 | 95 days | General | Boiler number 1528 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1923 | 07/02/1924 | 83 days | General | Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5397 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1925 | 06/04/1925 | 47 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1928 | 23/08/1928 | 56 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1930 | 17/07/1930 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1932 | 13/08/1932 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 514 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1935 | 22/11/1935 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1937 | 15/01/1938 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1940 | 17/02/1940 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1943 | 27/02/1943 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1948 | 02/10/1948 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63622 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1951 | 30/06/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1951 | 18/07/1951 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1953 | 16/01/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 22203 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1954 | 23/01/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1956 | 29/09/1956 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 22204 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1958 | 17/05/1958 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1960 | 28/05/1960 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 397 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
11/05/1917 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
11/02/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1922. Dep: 16/05/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1528 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1923. Dep: 07/02/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5397 |
||
19/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1925. Dep: 06/04/1925. | ||
11/08/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
29/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1928. Dep: 23/08/1928. | ||
07/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1930. Dep: 17/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1932. Dep: 13/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 514 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
08/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1935. Dep: 22/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1937. Dep: 15/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1940. Dep: 17/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
15/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3622 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
31/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63622 |
||
30/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1951. Dep: 30/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1951. Dep: 18/07/1951. | ||
14/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22203 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1954. Dep: 23/01/1954. | ||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
15/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22204 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958. | ||
01/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
29/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (41G) | ||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
26/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/04/1960. Dep: 28/05/1960. | ||
03/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
01/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63622 from Langwith Junction (41J) |