Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 915 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6526 Week
» 17572 Month
» 17572 Year
» 1682948 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1809 m/e 09/1917
London and North Western Railway 2923 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6565   17/12/1927
War Dept. 709   09/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21776
To Service During 09/1917
Taken into Stock 19/12/1927
Withdrawal Tue 09/09/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 24 yrs , 9 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 709 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow 16/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1917
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
NWE New England on 19/12/1927
CLK Colwick on 29/08/1932
   Withdrawn on 09/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1223)
24/09/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1210)
12/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 858)
17/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3288)
12/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 857)
23/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3322)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/09/1927 17/12/1927 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6565
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1930 05/04/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 17/09/1932 24/09/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1935 12/01/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1937 17/04/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1939 12/08/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1941 23/08/1941 18 days General
Boiler number 3322 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1809
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21776
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2923    
08/1921 Allocation      
19/12/1927 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
19/12/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
29/08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 709 from Colwick (CLK)    
09/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 709    

prev prev