|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/09/1927 | 17/12/1927 | 106 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6565 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1930 | 05/04/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1932 | 24/09/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1935 | 12/01/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1937 | 17/04/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1939 | 12/08/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1941 | 23/08/1941 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3322 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1809 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21776 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2923 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
03/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1927. Dep: 17/12/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6565 |
||
19/12/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
19/12/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
08/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1930. Dep: 05/04/1930. | ||
29/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1935. Dep: 12/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3322 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 709 from Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 709 |