Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 466 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5453 Week
» 13568 Month
» 141011 Year
» 1806387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1811 m/e 10/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6285   23/02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3739   26/05/1946
British Railways 63739 w/e 20/03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1917
O4/8 (2-8-0)17/05/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21778
To Service During 10/1917
Taken into Stock 07/03/1924
Withdrawal Sun 03/10/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 48 yrs , 3 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Arnott Young, Parkgate, 11/65

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1917
MAR   March on 07/03/1924
DON   Doncaster on 24/03/1924
MEX   Mexborough on 20/06/1943
CLK   Colwick on 28/01/1945
ANN   Annesley on 26/10/1947
39A   Gorton on 20/10/1950
39A   Gorton w/e 28/10/1950
40E   Langwith Junction on 25/12/1955
     Withdrawn on 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 31/12/1955
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1473)
18/06/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1756)
25/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1052)
16/01/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 807)
31/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1081)
02/04/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1116)
02/04/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
25/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1121)
22/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1340)
17/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1456)
01/06/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1115)
23/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3428)
12/02/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1016)
03/03/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22166)
11/04/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22105)
12/11/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22883)
17/05/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28332)
09/02/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28826)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 1924 23/02/1924   Heavy Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6285
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1926 18/06/1926 80 days General Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1928 01/10/1928 41 days General    
Gorton Works 24/01/1930 25/03/1930 61 days General Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1931 16/01/1932 67 days General Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1934 31/03/1934 34 days General Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1936 02/04/1936 33 days General Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1938 25/06/1938 36 days General Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1939 22/10/1939 101 days General Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1941 17/01/1942 49 days General Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1944 01/06/1944 15 days General Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1945 03/11/1945 31 days General    
Gorton Works 07/10/1946 23/11/1946 48 days General Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1948 21/03/1948 38 days Light Repair Renumbered to BR 63739
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1948 12/02/1949 53 days General Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1949 03/12/1949 44 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 06/12/1949 07/12/1949 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 24/01/1951 03/03/1951 39 days General Boiler number 22166 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1951 08/03/1951 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 14/03/1953 11/04/1953 29 days General Boiler number 22105 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1955 12/11/1955 45 days General Boiler number 22883 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1958 17/05/1958 65 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28332 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1958 20/09/1958 11 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 05/01/1962 09/02/1962 36 days General Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1811
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21778
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1924. Dep: 23/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6285
   
07/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
07/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
24/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
31/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1926. Dep: 18/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15)
   
22/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1928. Dep: 01/10/1928.    
24/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1930. Dep: 25/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1931. Dep: 16/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
   
26/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
   
01/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1936. Dep: 02/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
21/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15)
   
14/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1939. Dep: 22/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1941. Dep: 17/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
   
20/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1944. Dep: 01/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
   
28/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
04/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945.    
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3739    
07/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
13/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1948. Dep: 21/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63739
   
22/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1948. Dep: 12/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949.    
06/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1949. Dep: 07/12/1949.    
20/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
28/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
24/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22166 (Diagram 15)
   
07/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1951. Dep: 08/03/1951.    
14/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22105 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1955. Dep: 12/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22883 (Diagram 15)
   
25/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
14/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28332 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958.    
05/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1962. Dep: 09/02/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63739 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev