Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 914 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1822 Week
» 12967 Month
» 112752 Year
» 1778128 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1812 m/e 10/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6566   21/05/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3740   17/05/1946
British Railways 63740 w/e 03/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1917
O1 (2-8-0)04/08/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21779
To Service During 10/1917
Taken into Stock 19/05/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Service Life 45 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1917
DON   Doncaster on 19/05/1927
91W   To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 21/11/1940
WFD   Woodford Halse on 29/01/1943
WHL   West Hartlepool on 20/03/1943
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 05/03/1945
TDK   Tyne Dock on 31/03/1946
DAR   Darlington on 06/02/1949
DAR   Darlington w/e 12/02/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
53C   Hull Springhead on 05/02/1950
53C   Hull Springhead w/e 11/02/1950
53A   Hull Dairycoates on 21/05/1950
38B   Annesley on 02/09/1951
38B   Annesley w/e 08/09/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DAR Darlington w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates on 21/05/1950
LOAN 38B Annesley on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1017)
20/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1808)
29/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1234)
23/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1038)
24/12/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1089)
13/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1021)
20/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3302)
04/08/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5040)
01/11/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5037)
03/03/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28295)
14/02/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28839)
12/09/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28274)
21/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28840)
16/03/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28386)
23/10/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28984)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 05/03/1927 21/05/1927 78 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6566
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1929 13/07/1929 43 days General    
Gorton Works 06/06/1931 20/06/1931 15 days General Boiler number 1808 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1933 29/07/1933 8 days General Boiler number 1234 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1935 23/11/1935 8 days General Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1937 24/12/1937 14 days General Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1940 13/07/1940 8 days General Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1943 20/03/1943 16 days General Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1945 04/08/1945 92 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1947 01/11/1947 32 days General Boiler number 5037 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1948 03/04/1948 10 days Light Repair Renumbered to BR 63740
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1948 26/06/1948 17 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 02/02/1949 12/02/1949 11 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 22/03/1949 23/04/1949 33 days Heavy Casual    
Gorton Works 08/11/1949 10/12/1949 33 days Heavy Casual    
Gorton Works 25/01/1951 03/03/1951 38 days General Boiler number 28295 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1953 14/02/1953 23 days General Boiler number 28839 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1953 12/09/1953 24 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 28274 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1955 21/04/1955 36 days General Boiler number 28840 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1957 16/03/1957 39 days General Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1959 23/10/1959 39 days General Boiler number 28984 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1962 16/08/1962 52 days Heavy Intermediate    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1812
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21779
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
05/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6566
   
19/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/05/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
01/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1929. Dep: 13/07/1929.    
06/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1808 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1234 (Diagram 15)
   
16/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1935. Dep: 23/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15)
   
11/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1937. Dep: 24/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
29/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
05/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15)
   
20/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
05/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
05/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
17/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3740    
01/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1947. Dep: 01/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5037 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1948. Dep: 03/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63740
   
10/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/06/1948. Dep: 26/06/1948.    
02/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949.    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
22/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949.    
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
08/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1949. Dep: 10/12/1949.    
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
11/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
25/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28295 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
23/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28839 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/08/1953. Dep: 12/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28274 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1955. Dep: 21/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28840 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1959. Dep: 23/10/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28984 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/06/1962. Dep: 16/08/1962.    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63740 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev