|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/07/1928 | 25/10/1928 | 111 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6567 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1930 | 19/01/1931 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1933 | 01/04/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1935 | 16/03/1935 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1938 | 07/01/1939 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1941 | 01/02/1941 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 2 days | Special | Examined for WD |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1943 | 17/04/1943 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1945 | 05/01/1946 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/01/1948 | 13/02/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3741 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1949 | 05/11/1949 | 19 days | Heavy Casual | Renumbered to BR 63741 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1949 | 11/11/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1950 | 02/12/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1950 | 09/12/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22884 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1955 | 04/06/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22273 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1958 | 05/07/1958 | 51 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28969 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1961 | 24/06/1961 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1962 | 07/04/1962 | 11 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/05/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Shed stored) | Shed stored: 63741, 90059/70/120/647. | SLS/196506 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1815 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21782 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2962 | ||
07/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1928. Dep: 25/10/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6567 |
||
25/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/10/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
29/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 19/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1933. Dep: 01/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1938. Dep: 07/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1941. Dep: 01/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Special) - Arr: 12/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. Work undertaken: Examined for WD |
||
11/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3741 | ||
04/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1948. Dep: 13/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3741 |
||
18/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63741 |
||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 11/11/1949. | ||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
10/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
02/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1950. Dep: 02/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950. | ||
22/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22884 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22273 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28969 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1961. Dep: 24/06/1961. | ||
28/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1962. Dep: 07/04/1962. | ||
04/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63741 from Frodingham (36C) |