Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1816 m/e 10/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6568   25/06/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3742   01/09/1946
British Railways 63742 w/e 23/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1917
O4/8 (2-8-0)22/09/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21783
To Service During 10/1917
Taken into Stock 23/06/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sun 10/02/1963 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Service Life 45 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Horwich)

Notes
Notes Into Horwich for cutting up 6/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1917
IMM   Immingham on 23/06/1927
KEA   Keadby on 27/02/1930
IMM   Immingham on 17/03/1932
FRO   Frodingham on 11/06/1932
CLK   Colwick on 12/09/1944
ANN   Annesley on 12/10/1947
39A   Gorton on 20/10/1950
39A   Gorton w/e 28/10/1950
39B   Sheffield Darnall on 13/06/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 10/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   on 10/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1080)
27/02/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1265)
26/05/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1191)
18/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1868)
19/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3355)
10/05/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3253)
18/12/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1237)
18/06/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1287)
28/07/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22201)
05/09/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22204)
22/09/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28921)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 26/03/1927 25/06/1927 92 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6568
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1929 17/08/1929 36 days General    
Gorton Works 20/02/1932 27/02/1932 8 days General Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1934 26/05/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1191 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1936 18/07/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1868 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1938 19/11/1938 15 days General Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1941 10/05/1941 29 days General Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1943 18/12/1943 11 days General Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1945 21/07/1945 36 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 08/03/1947 19/04/1947 43 days General    
Gorton Works 09/10/1948 23/10/1948 15 days Heavy Renumbered to BR 63742
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1949 18/06/1949 22 days General Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1951 28/07/1951 36 days General Boiler number 22201 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1951 01/08/1951 3 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 22/08/1953 05/09/1953 15 days General Boiler number 22204 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1953 12/09/1953 5 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 29/10/1955 05/11/1955 8 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 04/08/1956 22/09/1956 50 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28921 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1957 14/12/1957 22 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 17/12/1957 20/12/1957 4 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 27/08/1960 24/09/1960 29 days Heavy Intermediate    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1816
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21783
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
26/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6568
   
23/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
23/06/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
13/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 17/08/1929.    
27/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
20/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1932. Dep: 27/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15)
   
17/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
11/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
12/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1934. Dep: 26/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1191 (Diagram 15)
   
04/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1868 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15)
   
12/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
   
08/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15)
   
12/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
16/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945.    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3742    
08/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947.    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
09/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/10/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63742
   
28/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1949. Dep: 18/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
   
20/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
28/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
23/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1951. Dep: 28/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22201 (Diagram 15)
   
30/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1951. Dep: 01/08/1951.    
22/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22204 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1953. Dep: 12/09/1953.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
29/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/10/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955.    
04/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28921 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957.    
17/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/12/1957. Dep: 20/12/1957.    
27/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/08/1960. Dep: 24/09/1960.    
10/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63742 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev