Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 80 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 80 Week
» 11225 Month
» 111010 Year
» 1776386 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1820 m/e 10/1917
London and North Western Railway 2879 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6570   13/08/1927
War Dept. 760   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21787
To Service During 10/1917
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Woodford Halse (WFD)
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 760 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1917
91LNWR   (on loan)   09/1919
ROD       08/1921
IMM   Immingham on 11/08/1927
NEA   Neasden on 05/11/1929
WFD   Woodford Halse on 13/02/1931
     Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1144)
30/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1331)
07/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1190)
10/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1146)
29/04/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1266)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3268)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 07/05/1927 13/08/1927 99 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6570
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1929 02/11/1929 36 days General    
Gorton Works 09/07/1932 30/07/1932 22 days General Boiler number 1331 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1934 07/07/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1936 10/10/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1146 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1939 29/04/1939 8 days General Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1941 27/09/1941 10 days General Boiler number 3268 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 760
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1820
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21787
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2879    
08/1921 Allocation      
07/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1927. Dep: 13/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6570
   
11/08/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
28/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929.    
05/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
13/02/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
09/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 30/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1331 (Diagram 15)
   
23/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
   
26/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1936. Dep: 10/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1146 (Diagram 15)
   
22/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15)
   
18/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3268 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 760
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 760 from Woodford Halse (WFD)    

prev prev