Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 39 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2204 Week
» 2204 Month
» 69066 Year
» 1734442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1821 m/e 10/1917
London and North Western Railway 2963 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6571   23/07/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3746   01/09/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3746   14/02/1948
British Railways 63746 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1917
O1 (2-8-0)27/11/1948
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21788
To Service During 10/1917
Taken into Stock 25/07/1927
Withdrawal Thu 27/02/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Service Life 46 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 6/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1917
91LNWR   (on loan)   06/1920
IMM   Immingham on 25/07/1927
FRO   Frodingham on 01/09/1934
CLK   Colwick on 11/09/1944
STV   Staveley (G.C.) on 09/11/1947
ANN   Annesley on 05/12/1948
ANN   Annesley w/e 11/12/1948
31B   March on 03/03/1957
41H   Staveley (G.C.) on 24/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 27/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 11/12/1948
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) on 25/11/1963
WDN   on 27/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1132)
30/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1315)
28/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1206)
28/07/1934 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
05/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 546)
15/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1176)
27/11/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3245)
23/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3309)
27/11/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5117)
04/11/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28273)
01/11/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28385)
04/09/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28383)
06/10/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28828)
25/10/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28265)
22/05/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28831)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 23/04/1927 23/07/1927 92 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6571
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1929 30/11/1929 36 days General    
Gorton Works 25/01/1930 01/02/1930 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 23/04/1932 30/04/1932 8 days General Boiler number 1315 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1934 28/07/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1936 05/09/1936 15 days General Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1938 15/10/1938 22 days General    
Gorton Works 22/02/1941 15/03/1941 22 days General Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1942 14/02/1942 25 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 12/11/1942 27/11/1942 16 days Heavy    
Gorton Works 02/11/1946 23/11/1946 22 days General Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1948 14/02/1948 15 days Light Repair Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3746
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1948 27/11/1948 78 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5117 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63746
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1949 15/10/1949 8 days Heavy Casual    
Gorton Works 14/10/1950 04/11/1950 22 days General Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 15 days Heavy Casual    
Gorton Works 08/03/1952 15/03/1952 8 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 15 days General Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1953 16/05/1953 8 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 31/07/1954 04/09/1954 36 days General Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1955 30/07/1955 36 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 01/09/1956 06/10/1956 36 days General Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1957 07/09/1957 8 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 27/09/1958 25/10/1958 29 days General Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 09/04/1962 22/05/1962 44 days General Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 15/06/1962 02/07/1962 18 days Unclassified    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1821
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21788
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2963    
23/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6571
   
25/07/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
25/07/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
26/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929.    
25/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 01/02/1930.    
23/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1315 (Diagram 15)
   
14/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
01/09/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
22/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
   
24/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938.    
22/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15)
   
21/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1942. Dep: 14/02/1942.    
12/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/11/1942. Dep: 27/11/1942.    
27/11/1943 Modification Diagram 15 number 3245 boiler fitted    
11/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3746    
02/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15)
   
09/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
31/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/01/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3746
   
11/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1948. Dep: 27/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5117 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63746
   
05/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949.    
14/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1950. Dep: 04/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1951. Dep: 19/05/1951.    
08/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952.    
18/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953.    
31/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955.    
01/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1956. Dep: 06/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
31/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957.    
27/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1962. Dep: 22/05/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1962. Dep: 02/07/1962.    
24/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
27/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63746 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev