|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/12/1923 | 12/01/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1258c |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1924 | 17/05/1924 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6258 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1926 | 11/12/1926 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1929 | 16/02/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1930 | 13/12/1930 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1162 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1933 | 18/03/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1935 | 29/06/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1937 | 24/07/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1942 | 03/10/1942 | 18 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 5 days | General | Boiler number 3682 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1946 | 23/02/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1947 | 01/03/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1948 | 28/08/1948 | 15 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3694 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63748 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1949 | 26/03/1949 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1950 | 28/10/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1950 | 07/11/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1952 | 02/02/1952 | 15 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1952 | 06/12/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1954 | 20/02/1954 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1955 | 11/06/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1955 | 23/06/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1958 | 06/12/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1827 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21794 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2926 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
29/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1923. Dep: 12/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1258c |
||
12/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/01/1924 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
22/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6258 |
||
23/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
09/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1926. Dep: 11/12/1926. | ||
19/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1929. Dep: 16/02/1929. | ||
29/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 13/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1162 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
23/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
16/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942. | ||
07/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
03/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3682 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946. | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3748 | ||
08/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/08/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3694 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63748 |
||
12/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949. | ||
14/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1950. Dep: 28/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D) |
||
06/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1950. Dep: 07/11/1950. | ||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
19/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
15/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D) |
||
06/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
07/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1955. Dep: 11/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1955. Dep: 23/06/1955. | ||
08/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1958. Dep: 06/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D) |
||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
19/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63748 from Frodingham (36C) |