|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/02/1928 | 14/04/1928 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6573 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1931 | 18/04/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1933 | 04/11/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1935 | 17/08/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3204 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1937 | 27/11/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1940 | 18/05/1940 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1942 | 29/08/1942 | 18 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1944 | 23/09/1944 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 3673 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3694 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3749 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1948 | 07/08/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3675 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63749 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1950 | 14/01/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1950 | 21/10/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1952 | 17/05/1952 | 8 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22334 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1952 | 22/05/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1953 | 04/07/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22308 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1955 | 02/04/1955 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22339 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1956 | 05/05/1956 | 43 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1957 | 23/02/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22321 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1959 | 27/10/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1829 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21796 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2965 | ||
04/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1928. Dep: 14/04/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6573 |
||
24/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/04/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
28/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1931. Dep: 18/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3204 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1937. Dep: 27/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1940. Dep: 18/05/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D) |
||
28/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
23/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
12/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1942. Dep: 29/08/1942. | ||
03/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
05/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3673 (Diagram 15D) |
||
27/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3694 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3749 |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. | ||
09/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
26/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1948. Dep: 07/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3675 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63749 |
||
07/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1950. Dep: 14/01/1950. | ||
07/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1950. Dep: 21/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D) |
||
10/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22334 (Diagram 15D) |
||
20/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1952. Dep: 22/05/1952. | ||
13/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1953. Dep: 04/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22308 (Diagram 15D) |
||
05/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22339 (Diagram 15D) |
||
24/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1956. Dep: 05/05/1956. | ||
26/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22321 (Diagram 15D) |
||
27/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/10/1959. Dep: 27/10/1959. | ||
31/10/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63749 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |