Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 456 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 456 Week
» 27077 Month
» 27077 Year
» 1692453 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1834 m/e 12/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6575   09/04/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3752   13/04/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3752   30/01/1948
British Railways 63752 w/e 13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1917
O1 (2-8-0)17/11/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21801
To Service During 12/1917
Taken into Stock 19/04/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 44 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 6/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1917
GOR Gorton on 19/04/1927
ANN Annesley on 06/10/1937
CLK Colwick on 13/10/1940
DON Doncaster on 23/01/1944
ARD Ardsley on 25/06/1945
GOR Gorton on 25/11/1945
WFD Woodford Halse on 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton on 20/10/1946
ANN Annesley on 20/02/1948
GOR Gorton on 07/03/1948
38B Annesley on 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 02/07/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1003)
18/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1054)
30/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1120)
20/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1945)
28/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1040)
16/12/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3214)
28/02/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1115)
29/04/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3269)
17/11/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5046)
02/1946 Drop Grate fitted
30/01/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5032)
06/05/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5024)
30/06/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28329)
04/10/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28298)
03/02/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28350)
28/02/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28329)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/02/1927 09/04/1927 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6575
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1929 03/08/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 27/06/1931 18/07/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1054 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1933 30/09/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1935 20/07/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1937 28/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1040 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1939 16/12/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1942 28/02/1942 10 days General
Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1945 29/04/1945 25 days General
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1945 17/11/1945 85 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5046 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 1946 02/1946   Light Repair
Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 01/01/1948 30/01/1948 30 days General
Boiler number 5032 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3752
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1948 13/11/1948 3 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63752
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1949 23/03/1949 10 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/04/1950 06/05/1950 34 days General
Boiler number 5024 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1951 30/06/1951 25 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1952 04/10/1952 24 days General
Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1953 17/10/1953 37 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 13/12/1954 03/02/1955 53 days General
Boiler number 28350 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1957 28/02/1957 30 days General
Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1958 24/01/1959 45 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 12/04/1961 18/05/1961 37 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 07/11/1961 02/12/1961 26 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Belle Vue MPD 2700, 2971, 5180/7,5429/30, 5503, 6100, 6031 an 6575 were noted on trials ex Gorton during November. 4665 was noted on a local passenger ex Manchester (London Road). other strangers included 1992 ex G.W. SLS/194601
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1834
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21801
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/04/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
06/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
13/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
25/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3752    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
07/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63752 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev