Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 503 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6114 Week
» 17160 Month
» 17160 Year
» 1682536 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1839 m/e 12/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6577   31/03/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3754   26/10/1946
British Railways 63754 w/e 10/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1917
O4/8 (2-8-0)24/08/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21806
To Service During 12/1917
Taken into Stock 31/03/1928
Withdrawal Fri 07/02/1964 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Albert Looms (Spondon)
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Looms, Spondon, 4/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1917
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 31/03/1928
HLS Hull Springhead on 18/11/1929
CUD Cudworth on 07/02/1930
HLS Hull Springhead on 08/01/1940
HTN Heaton on 24/02/1940
TDK Tyne Dock on 23/07/1945
HTN Heaton on 22/07/1946
TDK Tyne Dock on 08/09/1946
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 06/02/1949
HLS Hull Springhead on 04/12/1949
53A Hull Dairycoates on 21/05/1950
53E Cudworth on 12/11/1950
20C Royston on 12/08/1951
38A Colwick on 02/09/1951
   Withdrawn on 07/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates on 21/05/1950
ALLOC 53E Cudworth m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 20C Royston w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 20C Royston on 12/08/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/09/1951
WDN   on 07/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 861)
31/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1307)
05/08/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 938)
16/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1936)
07/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1005)
04/04/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3230)
08/01/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1090)
26/10/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3427)
10/09/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3422)
03/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22264)
16/09/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22267)
24/08/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28387)
22/04/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28386)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1928 31/03/1928   General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6577
 
Darlington Works 29/11/1930 31/01/1931 64 days General
Boiler number 1307 (Diagram 15)
 
Darlington Works 15/07/1933 05/08/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 938 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1935 16/03/1935 37 days General
Boiler number 1936 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1937 07/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1939 23/12/1939 27 days General  
Gorton Works 14/03/1942 04/04/1942 22 days General
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1942 26/12/1942 50 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 18/12/1943 08/01/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1946 26/10/1946 38 days General
Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3754
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1949 10/09/1949 30 days General
Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63754
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1952 03/05/1952 37 days General
Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1952 17/05/1952 12 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/08/1954 16/09/1954 32 days General
Boiler number 22267 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1957 24/08/1957 75 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28387 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1957 30/10/1957 44 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/03/1960 22/04/1960 31 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/01/1962 16/02/1962 32 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1839
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21806
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
31/03/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
31/03/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
07/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
08/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
24/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
22/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
08/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
12/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (53E)    
12/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
07/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63754 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev