|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1928 | 31/03/1928 | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6577 |
|||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1930 | 31/01/1931 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1307 (Diagram 15) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1933 | 05/08/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 938 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1935 | 16/03/1935 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 1936 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1937 | 07/08/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1939 | 23/12/1939 | 27 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1942 | 04/04/1942 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1942 | 26/12/1942 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1943 | 08/01/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3754 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1949 | 10/09/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63754 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1952 | 03/05/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1952 | 17/05/1952 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1954 | 16/09/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 22267 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1957 | 24/08/1957 | 75 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28387 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1957 | 30/10/1957 | 44 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1960 | 22/04/1960 | 31 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1962 | 16/02/1962 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1839 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21806 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1928. Dep: 31/03/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6577 |
||
31/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
31/03/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
18/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
07/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
29/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 31/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1307 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 938 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1936 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
24/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939. | ||
08/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
24/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
14/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1942. Dep: 04/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1942. Dep: 26/12/1942. | ||
18/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
22/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
08/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
19/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3754 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
12/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63754 |
||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
12/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (53E) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (53E) | ||
12/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Royston (20C) | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
28/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952. | ||
16/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1954. Dep: 16/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22267 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1957. Dep: 24/08/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28387 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/09/1957. Dep: 30/10/1957. | ||
23/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/03/1960. Dep: 22/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/01/1962. Dep: 16/02/1962. | ||
07/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63754 from Colwick (40E) |