Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 928 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1836 Week
» 12981 Month
» 112766 Year
» 1778142 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1841 m/e 01/1918
Great Central Railway 1255c   29/12/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6255   19/07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3756   07/06/1946
British Railways 63756 w/e 01/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21808
To Service During 01/1918
Taken into Stock 28/12/1923
Withdrawal Thu 18/06/1959 off Mexborough (41F)
Service Life 41 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 20/6/59

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1918
GOR   Gorton on 28/12/1923
FRO   Frodingham on 18/03/1939
CLK   Colwick on 11/09/1944
ANN   Annesley on 30/03/1947
CLK   Colwick on 04/07/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 10/07/1948
36B   Mexborough on 29/01/1956
     Withdrawn on 18/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 05/04/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   on 18/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1132)
19/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1544)
16/06/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1332)
20/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1282)
18/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1132)
18/08/1934 Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
30/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3239)
31/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3358)
07/06/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1008)
20/11/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3345)
08/06/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3222)
31/12/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3201)
07/04/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22174)
11/07/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22896)
19/11/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22141)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1923 29/12/1923 8 days Light Repair Renumbered to GCR 1255c
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1924 19/07/1924 64 days General Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6255
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1926 29/05/1926 71 days General    
Gorton Works 05/05/1928 16/06/1928 43 days General Boiler number 1332 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1930 19/07/1930 43 days General    
Gorton Works 06/08/1932 20/08/1932 15 days General Boiler number 1282 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1934 18/08/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1132 (Diagram 15)
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1936 30/05/1936 15 days General Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1938 31/12/1938 15 days General Boiler number 3358 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1941 07/06/1941 15 days General Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1943 20/11/1943 17 days General Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1946 08/06/1946 22 days General Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3756
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1948 31/12/1948 21 days General Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63756
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1951 07/04/1951 22 days General Boiler number 22174 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1951 10/04/1951 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 27/06/1953 11/07/1953 15 days General Boiler number 22896 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1953 18/07/1953 5 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 22/10/1955 19/11/1955 29 days General Boiler number 22141 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1841
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21808
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 29/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1255c
   
28/12/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/12/1923 To Stock To ROD stock    
17/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6255
   
20/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1926. Dep: 29/05/1926.    
05/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1928. Dep: 16/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1332 (Diagram 15)
   
07/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1930. Dep: 19/07/1930.    
06/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1932. Dep: 20/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1282 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1132 (Diagram 15)
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
   
16/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 15)
   
17/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3358 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
24/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1941. Dep: 07/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15)
   
04/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15)
   
11/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
18/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 08/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3756
   
30/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
04/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
11/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63756
   
17/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1951. Dep: 07/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22174 (Diagram 15)
   
09/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1951. Dep: 10/04/1951.    
27/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22896 (Diagram 15)
   
14/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1953. Dep: 18/07/1953.    
22/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1955. Dep: 19/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22141 (Diagram 15)
   
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63756 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev