Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 312 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 3665 Week
» 30286 Month
» 30286 Year
» 1695662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1657 m/e 11/1917
London and North Western Railway 2907 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6350   07/06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3676   24/11/1946
British Railways 63676 w/e 16/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/311/1917
O1 (2-8-0)27/01/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3701
To Service During 11/1917
Taken into Stock 07/06/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 45 yrs , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 12/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1917
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton on 07/06/1924
19D Heaton Mersey on 17/07/1940
GOR Gorton on 01/08/1940
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 22/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse on 03/02/1943
WHL West Hartlepool on 21/03/1943
HLS Hull Springhead on 02/03/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 04/06/1945
TDK Tyne Dock on 26/08/1946
DAR Darlington on 06/02/1949
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
53C Hull Springhead on 05/02/1950
53A Hull Dairycoates on 21/05/1950
38B Annesley on 02/09/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 24/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DAR Darlington w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates on 21/05/1950
LOAN 38B Annesley on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 24/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1227)
13/07/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1209)
04/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1169)
02/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1033)
08/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1225)
09/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1940)
15/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3313)
13/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1102)
27/01/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5020)
24/08/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5006)
14/04/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5083)
12/05/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28316)
28/02/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28393)
28/05/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28389)
25/05/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28840)
21/09/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28355)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 07/06/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6350
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1927 18/06/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 25/05/1929 13/07/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1930 08/11/1930 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/06/1931 04/07/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1933 02/09/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1935 08/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1937 09/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1940 15/06/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1943 13/03/1943 12 days General
Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1944 27/01/1945 71 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5020 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1946 24/08/1946 24 days General
Boiler number 5006 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1949 14/04/1949 28 days General
Boiler number 5083 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63676
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1951 12/05/1951 31 days General
Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1953 28/02/1953 26 days General
Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1954 13/03/1954 27 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 25/04/1955 28/05/1955 34 days General
Boiler number 28389 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1957 25/05/1957 30 days General
Boiler number 28840 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1959 08/12/1959 36 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 08/08/1962 21/09/1962 45 days General
Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1657
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3701
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2907    
08/1921 Allocation      
07/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/06/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
17/07/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
01/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
03/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
21/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
02/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
04/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
26/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3676    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
24/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63676 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev