Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 36 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4755 Week
» 15900 Month
» 115685 Year
» 1781061 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1659 m/e 11/1917
London and North Western Railway 2909 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6332   17/05/1924
War Dept. 755   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3703
To Service During 11/1917
Taken into Stock 17/05/1924
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Doncaster (DON)
Service Life 23 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 755 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1917
91LNWR   (on loan)   12/1919
ROD       08/1921
GOR   Gorton on 14/05/1924
MAR   March on 28/02/1929
DON   Doncaster on 25/07/1933
     Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1966)
11/10/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1491)
31/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1944)
02/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1256)
31/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1016)
27/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1136)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3443)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 17/05/1924 85 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6332
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1926 31/07/1926 57 days General    
Gorton Works 11/08/1928 29/09/1928 50 days General    
Gorton Works 20/09/1930 11/10/1930 22 days General Boiler number 1491 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1932 31/12/1932 15 days General Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1935 02/03/1935 8 days General Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1936 31/12/1936 13 days General Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1939 11/02/1939 15 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 13/05/1939 27/05/1939 15 days General Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1941 27/09/1941 15 days General Boiler number 3443 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 755
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1659
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3703
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2909    
08/1921 Allocation      
23/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6332
   
14/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/05/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1926. Dep: 31/07/1926.    
11/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928.    
28/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
20/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1930. Dep: 11/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1491 (Diagram 15)
   
17/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1932. Dep: 31/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15)
   
25/07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
   
19/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
   
28/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1939. Dep: 11/02/1939.    
13/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3443 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 755
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 755 from Doncaster (DON)    

prev prev